Manufacturer: Beyer Peacock Ltd.
Builder | Beyer Peacock Ltd. |
Order Date | 1931 |
For | 25 Steam locomotives |
Class | 57xx |
Administration | Swindon Works order #273 |
Number (as built) | Works Number | Class | Built For | Designer | Wheels | Date to Service | Date Withdrawn | Info |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
8700 | 6680 | 57xx | GWR | Collett | 0-6-0PT | 02/1931 | 03/10/1963 | |
8701 | 6681 | 57xx | GWR | Collett | 0-6-0PT | 02/1931 | 29/03/1963 | |
8702 | 6682 | 57xx | GWR | Collett | 0-6-0PT | 02/1931 | 06/05/1964 | |
8703 | 6683 | 57xx | GWR | Collett | 0-6-0PT | 02/1931 | 06/01/1958 | |
8704 | 6684 | 57xx | GWR | Collett | 0-6-0PT | 02/1931 | 29/02/1960 | |
8705 | 6685 | 57xx | GWR | Collett | 0-6-0PT | 02/1931 | 27/04/1961 | |
8706 | 6686 | 57xx | GWR | Collett | 0-6-0PT | 03/1931 | 04/07/1961 | |
8707 | 6687 | 57xx | GWR | Collett | 0-6-0PT | 02/1931 | 06/07/1964 | |
8708 | 6688 | 57xx | GWR | Collett | 0-6-0PT | 03/1931 | 19/05/1960 | |
8709 | 6689 | 57xx | GWR | Collett | 0-6-0PT | 02/1931 | 27/09/1962 | |
8710 | 6690 | 57xx | GWR | Collett | 0-6-0PT | 03/1931 | 08/03/1963 | |
8711 | 6691 | 57xx | GWR | Collett | 0-6-0PT | 03/1931 | 15/03/1962 | |
8712 | 6692 | 57xx | GWR | Collett | 0-6-0PT | 03/1931 | 14/01/1963 | |
8713 | 6693 | 57xx | GWR | Collett | 0-6-0PT | 03/1931 | 15/03/1962 | |
8714 | 6694 | 57xx | GWR | Collett | 0-6-0PT | 03/1931 | 27/11/1964 | |
8715 | 6695 | 57xx | GWR | Collett | 0-6-0PT | 03/1931 | 02/04/1962 | |
8716 | 6696 | 57xx | GWR | Collett | 0-6-0PT | 03/1931 | 20/04/1964 | |
8717 | 6697 | 57xx | GWR | Collett | 0-6-0PT | 03/1931 | 06/07/1964 | |
8718 | 6698 | 57xx | GWR | Collett | 0-6-0PT | 03/1931 | 23/07/1966 | |
8719 | 6699 | 57xx | GWR | Collett | 0-6-0PT | 03/1931 | 14/05/1962 | |
8720 | 6700 | 57xx | GWR | Collett | 0-6-0PT | 03/1931 | 28/09/1964 | |
8721 | 6701 | 57xx | GWR | Collett | 0-6-0PT | 03/1931 | 18/07/1961 | |
8722 | 6702 | 57xx | GWR | Collett | 0-6-0PT | 04/1931 | 27/04/1961 | |
8723 | 6703 | 57xx | GWR | Collett | 0-6-0PT | 04/1931 | 06/07/1964 | |
8724 | 6704 | 57xx | GWR | Collett | 0-6-0PT | 04/1931 | 18/07/1962 |