Manufacturer: Beyer Peacock Ltd.
Builder | Beyer Peacock Ltd. |
Order Date | 1961 |
For | 50 Diesel locomotives |
Class | Hymek |
Administration | Swindon Works order #455 |
Number (as built) | Works Number | Class | Built For | Designer | Wheels | Date to Service | Date Withdrawn | Info |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
D7045 | 7949 | 35 | BR | B-B | 10/08/1962 | 11/11/1972 | ||
D7046 | 7950 | 35 | BR | B-B | 15/08/1962 | 01/01/1972 | ||
D7047 | 7951 | 35 | BR | B-B | 15/08/1962 | 01/01/1972 | ||
D7048 | 7952 | 35 | BR | B-B | 26/09/1962 | 01/01/1972 | ||
D7049 | 7953 | 35 | BR | B-B | 05/10/1962 | 01/01/1972 | ||
D7050 | 7954 | 35 | BR | B-B | 05/10/1962 | 01/11/1972 | ||
D7051 | 7955 | 35 | BR | B-B | 06/10/1962 | 01/01/1972 | ||
D7052 | 7956 | 35 | BR | B-B | 24/10/1962 | 30/11/1972 | ||
D7053 | 7957 | 35 | BR | B-B | 24/10/1962 | 01/01/1972 | ||
D7054 | 7958 | 35 | BR | B-B | 16/11/1962 | 30/12/1972 | ||
D7055 | 7959 | 35 | BR | B-B | 02/11/1962 | 09/06/1973 | ||
D7056 | 7960 | 35 | BR | B-B | 13/11/1962 | 01/01/1972 | ||
D7057 | 7961 | 35 | BR | B-B | 22/11/1962 | 01/01/1972 | ||
D7058 | 7962 | 35 | BR | B-B | 28/11/1962 | 03/10/1971 | ||
D7059 | 7963 | 35 | BR | B-B | 28/11/1962 | 03/10/1971 | ||
D7060 | 7964 | 35 | BR | B-B | 19/12/1962 | 03/10/1971 | ||
D7061 | 7965 | 35 | BR | B-B | 29/12/1962 | 01/01/1972 | ||
D7062 | 7966 | 35 | BR | B-B | 31/01/1963 | 03/10/1971 | ||
D7063 | 7967 | 35 | BR | B-B | 28/12/1962 | 03/10/1971 | ||
D7064 | 7968 | 35 | BR | B-B | 29/01/1963 | 03/10/1971 | ||
D7065 | 7969 | 35 | BR | B-B | 28/01/1963 | 01/01/1972 | ||
D7066 | 7970 | 35 | BR | B-B | 31/01/1963 | 29/11/1971 | ||
D7067 | 7971 | 35 | BR | B-B | 06/02/1963 | 03/10/1971 | ||
D7068 | 7972 | 35 | BR | B-B | 13/02/1963 | 30/12/1972 | ||
D7069 | 7973 | 35 | BR | B-B | 22/02/1963 | 03/10/1971 | ||
D7070 | 7974 | 35 | BR | B-B | 08/03/1963 | 08/09/1972 | ||
D7071 | 7975 | 35 | BR | B-B | 11/03/1963 | 01/01/1972 | ||
D7072 | 7976 | 35 | BR | B-B | 22/03/1963 | 03/10/1971 | ||
D7073 | 7977 | 35 | BR | B-B | 11/03/1963 | 10/12/1971 | ||
D7074 | 7978 | 35 | BR | B-B | 26/03/1963 | 30/12/1972 | ||
D7075 | 7979 | 35 | BR | B-B | 29/03/1963 | 06/05/1973 | ||
D7076 | 7980 | 35 | BR | B-B | 03/05/1963 | 06/05/1973 | ||
D7077 | 7981 | 35 | BR | B-B | 13/12/1963 | 02/07/1972 | ||
D7078 | 7982 | 35 | BR | B-B | 03/05/1963 | 03/10/1971 | ||
D7079 | 7983 | 35 | BR | B-B | 16/12/1963 | 03/10/1971 | ||
D7080 | 7984 | 35 | BR | B-B | 14/12/1963 | 07/11/1972 | ||
D7081 | 7985 | 35 | BR | B-B | 12/12/1963 | 11/09/1971 | ||
D7082 | 7986 | 35 | BR | B-B | 05/06/1963 | 19/04/1972 | ||
D7083 | 7987 | 35 | BR | B-B | 05/06/1963 | 03/10/1971 | ||
D7084 | 7988 | 35 | BR | B-B | 26/06/1963 | 11/10/1972 | ||
D7085 | 7989 | 35 | BR | B-B | 24/06/1963 | 11/10/1972 | ||
D7086 | 7990 | 35 | BR | B-B | 20/07/1963 | 01/01/1972 | ||
D7087 | 7991 | 35 | BR | B-B | 20/07/1963 | 07/10/1972 | ||
D7088 | 7992 | 35 | BR | B-B | 29/10/1963 | 01/01/1972 | ||
D7089 | 7993 | 35 | BR | B-B | 23/07/1963 | 06/05/1973 | ||
D7090 | 7994 | 35 | BR | B-B | 24/09/1963 | 12/06/1972 | ||
D7091 | 7995 | 35 | BR | B-B | 24/09/1963 | 10/08/1972 | ||
D7092 | 7996 | 35 | BR | B-B | 16/12/1963 | 20/06/1972 | ||
D7093 | 7997 | 35 | BR | B-B | 14/12/1963 | 26/11/1974 | ||
D7094 | 7998 | 35 | BR | B-B | 14/12/1963 | 01/11/1972 |