Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Advertising



Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 2 Online
» 88 Today
» 1127 Yesterday
» 88 Week
» 26709 Month
» 26709 Year
» 1692085 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Manufacturer: Beyer Peacock Ltd.



Order Details for Lot No: BP/BP975
Builder Beyer Peacock Ltd.
Order Date 1903
For 10 Steam locomotives
Class J11

Number (as built) Works Number Class Built For Designer Wheels Date to Service Date Withdrawn Info
198 4521 J11 GCR Robinson 0-6-0 09/1903 24/08/1962  
201 4522 J11 GCR Robinson 0-6-0 10/1903 08/02/1957  
203 4523 J11 GCR Robinson 0-6-0 10/1903 30/01/1960  
205 4524 J11 GCR Robinson 0-6-0 10/1903 23/09/1962  
206 4525 J11 GCR Robinson 0-6-0 10/1903 09/08/1962  
209 4526 J11 GCR Robinson 0-6-0 10/1903 07/11/1955  
210 4527 J11 GCR Robinson 0-6-0 10/1903 13/09/1954  
211 4528 J11 GCR Robinson 0-6-0 10/1903 13/07/1959  
214 4529 J11 GCR Robinson 0-6-0 11/1903 24/06/1961  
215 4530 J11 GCR Robinson 0-6-0 11/1903 20/10/1958