Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Advertising



Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 3 Online
» 86 Today
» 1070 Yesterday
» 86 Week
» 86 Month
» 66948 Year
» 1732324 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Manufacturer: Beyer Peacock Ltd.



Order Details for Lot No: BP/BP976
Builder Beyer Peacock Ltd.
Order Date 1904
For 15 Steam locomotives
Class J11

Number (as built) Works Number Class Built For Designer Wheels Date to Service Date Withdrawn Info
216 4543 J11 GCR Robinson 0-6-0 02/1904 18/10/1954  
218 4544 J11 GCR Robinson 0-6-0 02/1904 04/08/1958  
219 4545 J11 GCR Robinson 0-6-0 02/1904 04/02/1961  
221 4546 J11 GCR Robinson 0-6-0 03/1904 14/03/1955  
222 4547 J11 GCR Robinson 0-6-0 03/1904 17/11/1958  
223 4548 J11 GCR Robinson 0-6-0 03/1904 02/06/1958  
224 4549 J11 GCR Robinson 0-6-0 03/1904 17/12/1958  
225 4550 J11 GCR Robinson 0-6-0 04/1904 23/09/1962  
  4551 J11 GCR Robinson 0-6-0 04/1904 21/03/1955  
227 4552 J11 GCR Robinson 0-6-0 04/1904 11/03/1960  
228 4553 J11 GCR Robinson 0-6-0 04/1904 16/10/1957  
229 4554 J11 GCR Robinson 0-6-0 04/1904 08/08/1955  
230 4555 J11 GCR Robinson 0-6-0 04/1904 30/10/1959  
231 4556 J11 GCR Robinson 0-6-0 04/1904 29/08/1961  
234 4557 J11 GCR Robinson 0-6-0 04/1904 10/02/1958