Manufacturer: Crewe Works
Builder | Crewe Works |
Order Date | 08/1882 |
For | 60 Steam locomotives |
Class | Coal Tank |
Number (as built) | Works Number | Class | Built For | Designer | Wheels | Date to Service | Date Withdrawn | Info |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
2458 | 2556 | Coal Tank | LNWR | Webb | 0-6-2T | 08/1882 | 11/1947 | |
2459 | 2557 | Coal Tank | LNWR | Webb | 0-6-2T | 08/1882 | 06/1927 | |
2460 | 2558 | Coal Tank | LNWR | Webb | 0-6-2T | 08/1882 | 12/1930 | |
2461 | 2559 | Coal Tank | LNWR | Webb | 0-6-2T | 08/1882 | 07/1937 | |
2462 | 2560 | Coal Tank | LNWR | Webb | 0-6-2T | 08/1882 | 1931 | |
2463 | 2561 | Coal Tank | LNWR | Webb | 0-6-2T | 08/1882 | 30/09/1954 | |
996 | 2562 | Coal Tank | LNWR | Webb | 0-6-2T | 08/1882 | 11/1930 | |
991 | 2563 | Coal Tank | LNWR | Webb | 0-6-2T | 08/1882 | 11/1928 | |
701 | 2564 | Coal Tank | LNWR | Webb | 0-6-2T | 08/1882 | 04/1946 | |
770 | 2565 | Coal Tank | LNWR | Webb | 0-6-2T | 08/1882 | 30/04/1954 | |
605 | 2566 | Coal Tank | LNWR | Webb | 0-6-2T | 08/1882 | 11/1928 | |
611 | 2567 | Coal Tank | LNWR | Webb | 0-6-2T | 09/1882 | 08/1947 | |
682 | 2568 | Coal Tank | LNWR | Webb | 0-6-2T | 09/1882 | 03/1946 | |
292 | 2569 | Coal Tank | LNWR | Webb | 0-6-2T | 09/1882 | 04/1946 | |
679 | 2570 | Coal Tank | LNWR | Webb | 0-6-2T | 09/1882 | 31/08/1953 | |
717 | 2571 | Coal Tank | LNWR | Webb | 0-6-2T | 09/1882 | 11/1946 | |
140 | 2572 | Coal Tank | LNWR | Webb | 0-6-2T | 09/1882 | 1932 | |
157 | 2573 | Coal Tank | LNWR | Webb | 0-6-2T | 09/1882 | 1931 | |
158 | 2574 | Coal Tank | LNWR | Webb | 0-6-2T | 09/1882 | 04/1927 | |
267 | 2575 | Coal Tank | LNWR | Webb | 0-6-2T | 09/1882 | 1932 | |
693 | 2585 | Coal Tank | LNWR | Webb | 0-6-2T | 09/1882 | 11/1930 | |
997 | 2586 | Coal Tank | LNWR | Webb | 0-6-2T | 09/1882 | 10/1934 | |
268 | 2587 | Coal Tank | LNWR | Webb | 0-6-2T | 09/1882 | 03/1936 | |
269 | 2588 | Coal Tank | LNWR | Webb | 0-6-2T | 09/1882 | 12/1945 | |
270 | 2589 | Coal Tank | LNWR | Webb | 0-6-2T | 09/1882 | 10/1928 | |
272 | 2590 | Coal Tank | LNWR | Webb | 0-6-2T | 01/1883 | 10/1947 | |
273 | 2591 | Coal Tank | LNWR | Webb | 0-6-2T | 01/1883 | 11/1949 | |
274 | 2592 | Coal Tank | LNWR | Webb | 0-6-2T | 01/1883 | 04/1928 | |
277 | 2593 | Coal Tank | LNWR | Webb | 0-6-2T | 01/1883 | 08/1955 | |
281 | 2594 | Coal Tank | LNWR | Webb | 0-6-2T | 01/1883 | 04/1927 | |
673 | 2595 | Coal Tank | LNWR | Webb | 0-6-2T | 01/1883 | 06/1946 | |
797 | 2596 | Coal Tank | LNWR | Webb | 0-6-2T | 01/1883 | 11/1944 | |
1009 | 2597 | Coal Tank | LNWR | Webb | 0-6-2T | 01/1883 | 16/10/1948 | |
629 | 2598 | Coal Tank | LNWR | Webb | 0-6-2T | 02/1883 | 11/1944 | |
747 | 2599 | Coal Tank | LNWR | Webb | 0-6-2T | 02/1883 | 24/05/1952 | |
1015 | 2600 | Coal Tank | LNWR | Webb | 0-6-2T | 02/1883 | 09/1924 | |
671 | 2601 | Coal Tank | LNWR | Webb | 0-6-2T | 02/1883 | 1933 | |
607 | 2602 | Coal Tank | LNWR | Webb | 0-6-2T | 02/1883 | 02/1928 | |
690 | 2603 | Coal Tank | LNWR | Webb | 0-6-2T | 02/1883 | 03/1946 | |
615 | 2604 | Coal Tank | LNWR | Webb | 0-6-2T | 02/1883 | 01/1948 | |
2473 | 2605 | Coal Tank | LNWR | Webb | 0-6-2T | 02/1883 | 04/1927 | |
2474 | 2606 | Coal Tank | LNWR | Webb | 0-6-2T | 02/1883 | 05/1928 | |
2475 | 2607 | Coal Tank | LNWR | Webb | 0-6-2T | 02/1883 | 12/1934 | |
2476 | 2608 | Coal Tank | LNWR | Webb | 0-6-2T | 02/1883 | 09/1944 | |
2477 | 2609 | Coal Tank | LNWR | Webb | 0-6-2T | 02/1883 | 07/1933 | |
2478 | 2610 | Coal Tank | LNWR | Webb | 0-6-2T | 02/1883 | 06/1926 | |
2479 | 2611 | Coal Tank | LNWR | Webb | 0-6-2T | 03/1883 | 05/1929 | |
2480 | 2612 | Coal Tank | LNWR | Webb | 0-6-2T | 03/1883 | 03/1949 | |
2481 | 2613 | Coal Tank | LNWR | Webb | 0-6-2T | 03/1883 | 12/1947 | |
2482 | 2614 | Coal Tank | LNWR | Webb | 0-6-2T | 03/1883 | 03/1926 | |
2483 | 2615 | Coal Tank | LNWR | Webb | 0-6-2T | 03/1883 | 07/1934 | |
2484 | 2616 | Coal Tank | LNWR | Webb | 0-6-2T | 03/1883 | 11/1936 | |
2485 | 2617 | Coal Tank | LNWR | Webb | 0-6-2T | 03/1883 | 10/1947 | |
2486 | 2618 | Coal Tank | LNWR | Webb | 0-6-2T | 03/1883 | 11/1932 | |
2487 | 2619 | Coal Tank | LNWR | Webb | 0-6-2T | 03/1883 | 09/1932 | |
2488 | 2620 | Coal Tank | LNWR | Webb | 0-6-2T | 04/1883 | 07/1934 | |
2489 | 2621 | Coal Tank | LNWR | Webb | 0-6-2T | 04/1883 | 04/1926 | |
2490 | 2622 | Coal Tank | LNWR | Webb | 0-6-2T | 04/1883 | 01/1947 | |
2491 | 2623 | Coal Tank | LNWR | Webb | 0-6-2T | 04/1883 | 12/1945 | |
2492 | 2624 | Coal Tank | LNWR | Webb | 0-6-2T | 04/1883 | 09/1926 |