Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Advertising



Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 1 Online
» 104 Today
» 1120 Yesterday
» 3493 Week
» 22394 Month
» 22394 Year
» 1687770 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Manufacturer: Darlington Works



Order Details for Lot No: DA/A177
Builder Darlington Works
Order Date 01/01/1894
For 10 Steam locomotives
Class G5

Number (as built) Works Number Class Built For Designer Wheels Date to Service Date Withdrawn Info
1096   G5 NER Worsdell 0-4-4T 05/1894 16/04/1956  
1687   G5 NER Worsdell 0-4-4T 06/1894 08/03/1955  
1691   G5 NER Worsdell 0-4-4T 06/1894 09/02/1953  
1701   G5 NER Worsdell 0-4-4T 06/1894 19/09/1955  
1702   G5 NER Worsdell 0-4-4T 06/1894 17/11/1952  
1765   G5 NER Worsdell 0-4-4T 06/1894 25/06/1951  
1783   G5 NER Worsdell 0-4-4T 06/1894 27/11/1958  
1788   G5 NER Worsdell 0-4-4T 06/1894 06/12/1954  
1769   G5 NER Worsdell 0-4-4T 08/1894 17/12/1958  
1791   G5 NER Worsdell 0-4-4T 09/1894 15/03/1955