Manufacturer: Darlington Works
Builder | Darlington Works |
Order Date | 01/1897 |
For | 20 Steam locomotives |
Class | G5 |
Number (as built) | Works Number | Class | Built For | Designer | Wheels | Date to Service | Date Withdrawn | Info |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
1911 | G5 | NER | Worsdell | 0-4-4T | 05/1897 | 03/12/1956 | ||
1912 | G5 | NER | Worsdell | 0-4-4T | 06/1897 | 27/03/1956 | ||
1913 | G5 | NER | Worsdell | 0-4-4T | 06/1897 | 16/02/1953 | ||
1914 | G5 | NER | Worsdell | 0-4-4T | 06/1897 | 12/08/1952 | ||
1915 | G5 | NER | Worsdell | 0-4-4T | 06/1897 | 04/04/1955 | ||
1916 | G5 | NER | Worsdell | 0-4-4T | 06/1897 | 15/01/1957 | ||
1917 | G5 | NER | Worsdell | 0-4-4T | 06/1897 | 08/03/1954 | ||
1918 | G5 | NER | Worsdell | 0-4-4T | 06/1897 | 08/03/1955 | ||
1919 | G5 | NER | Worsdell | 0-4-4T | 06/1897 | 15/09/1958 | ||
1920 | G5 | NER | Worsdell | 0-4-4T | 06/1897 | 04/12/1956 | ||
1752 | G5 | NER | Worsdell | 0-4-4T | 09/1897 | 08/05/1950 | ||
1692 | G5 | NER | Worsdell | 0-4-4T | 09/1897 | 06/12/1955 | ||
1693 | G5 | NER | Worsdell | 0-4-4T | 10/1897 | 08/03/1955 | ||
1739 | G5 | NER | Worsdell | 0-4-4T | 10/1897 | 10/04/1956 | ||
1745 | G5 | NER | Worsdell | 0-4-4T | 10/1897 | 23/02/1953 | ||
526 | G5 | NER | Worsdell | 0-4-4T | 11/1897 | 22/02/1955 | ||
1755 | G5 | NER | Worsdell | 0-4-4T | 11/1897 | 08/12/1958 | ||
1759 | G5 | NER | Worsdell | 0-4-4T | 11/1897 | 06/1948 | ||
1754 | G5 | NER | Worsdell | 0-4-4T | 12/1897 | 23/05/1955 | ||
1775 | G5 | NER | Worsdell | 0-4-4T | 12/1897 | 22/11/1955 |