Manufacturer: Darlington Works
Builder | Darlington Works |
Order Date | 1899 |
For | 20 Steam locomotives |
Class | J25 |
Number (as built) | Works Number | Class | Built For | Designer | Wheels | Date to Service | Date Withdrawn | Info |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
2046 | J25 | NER | Worsdell | 0-6-0 | 12/1899 | 15/09/1959 | ||
2047 | J25 | NER | Worsdell | 0-6-0 | 12/1899 | 03/11/1954 | ||
2048 | J25 | NER | Worsdell | 0-6-0 | 12/1899 | 22/08/1959 | ||
25 | J25 | NER | Worsdell | 0-6-0 | 12/1899 | 08/1954 | ||
463 | J25 | NER | Worsdell | 0-6-0 | 12/1899 | 31/05/1954 | ||
2049 | J25 | NER | Worsdell | 0-6-0 | 03/1900 | 01/1934 | ||
2050 | J25 | NER | Worsdell | 0-6-0 | 03/1900 | 11/1938 | ||
2051 | J25 | NER | Worsdell | 0-6-0 | 03/1900 | 02/06/1948 | ||
2052 | J25 | NER | Worsdell | 0-6-0 | 04/1900 | 04/1933 | ||
2053 | J25 | NER | Worsdell | 0-6-0 | 04/1900 | 27/10/1954 | ||
2054 | J25 | NER | Worsdell | 0-6-0 | 04/1900 | 01/1937 | ||
2055 | J25 | NER | Worsdell | 0-6-0 | 05/1900 | 07/12/1959 | ||
2056 | J25 | NER | Worsdell | 0-6-0 | 05/1900 | 01/1950 | ||
2057 | J25 | NER | Worsdell | 0-6-0 | 05/1900 | 28/05/1956 | ||
2058 | J25 | NER | Worsdell | 0-6-0 | 06/1900 | 10/1945 | ||
2059 | J25 | NER | Worsdell | 0-6-0 | 06/1900 | 03/11/1954 | ||
2060 | J25 | NER | Worsdell | 0-6-0 | 06/1900 | 06/1944 | ||
29 | J25 | NER | Worsdell | 0-6-0 | 06/1900 | 22/08/1960 | ||
257 | J25 | NER | Worsdell | 0-6-0 | 06/1900 | 15/08/1960 | ||
459 | J25 | NER | Worsdell | 0-6-0 | 06/1900 | 09/01/1961 |