Manufacturer: Darlington Works
Builder | Darlington Works |
Order Date | 12/1934 |
For | 39 Steam locomotives |
Class | J39 |
Number (as built) | Works Number | Class | Built For | Designer | Wheels | Date to Service | Date Withdrawn | Info |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
2941 | 1617 | J39 | LNER | Gresley | 0-6-0 | 07/06/1935 | 26/11/1962 | |
2942 | 1618 | J39 | LNER | Gresley | 0-6-0 | 08/06/1935 | 18/05/1959 | |
2943 | 1619 | J39 | LNER | Gresley | 0-6-0 | 13/06/1935 | 17/04/1961 | |
2944 | 1620 | J39 | LNER | Gresley | 0-6-0 | 19/06/1935 | 20/10/1962 | |
2945 | 1621 | J39 | LNER | Gresley | 0-6-0 | 21/06/1935 | 28/09/1959 | |
2946 | 1622 | J39 | LNER | Gresley | 0-6-0 | 28/06/1935 | 27/10/1962 | |
2947 | 1623 | J39 | LNER | Gresley | 0-6-0 | 03/07/1935 | 18/02/1961 | |
2948 | 1624 | J39 | LNER | Gresley | 0-6-0 | 05/07/1935 | 13/11/1962 | |
2949 | 1625 | J39 | LNER | Gresley | 0-6-0 | 10/07/1935 | 20/10/1962 | |
2950 | 1626 | J39 | LNER | Gresley | 0-6-0 | 11/07/1935 | 28/09/1959 | |
2951 | 1627 | J39 | LNER | Gresley | 0-6-0 | 06/08/1935 | 11/04/1961 | |
2952 | 1628 | J39 | LNER | Gresley | 0-6-0 | 07/08/1935 | 11/03/1960 | |
2953 | 1629 | J39 | LNER | Gresley | 0-6-0 | 13/08/1935 | 24/03/1962 | |
2981 | 1630 | J39 | LNER | Gresley | 0-6-0 | 21/08/1935 | 17/02/1961 | |
2982 | 1631 | J39 | LNER | Gresley | 0-6-0 | 30/08/1935 | 27/11/1962 | |
2983 | 1634 | J39 | LNER | Gresley | 0-6-0 | 04/09/1935 | 20/01/1960 | |
2984 | 1635 | J39 | LNER | Gresley | 0-6-0 | 10/09/1935 | 27/10/1962 | |
2985 | 1636 | J39 | LNER | Gresley | 0-6-0 | 13/09/1935 | 20/08/1960 | |
2986 | 1637 | J39 | LNER | Gresley | 0-6-0 | 13/09/1935 | 21/03/1960 | |
2987 | 1638 | J39 | LNER | Gresley | 0-6-0 | 18/09/1935 | 08/02/1960 | |
2988 | 1639 | J39 | LNER | Gresley | 0-6-0 | 26/09/1935 | 12/05/1961 | |
2989 | 1640 | J39 | LNER | Gresley | 0-6-0 | 01/10/1935 | 11/07/1960 | |
2990 | 1641 | J39 | LNER | Gresley | 0-6-0 | 04/10/1935 | 19/10/1959 | |
2991 | 1642 | J39 | LNER | Gresley | 0-6-0 | 09/10/1935 | 27/10/1962 | |
2992 | 1643 | J39 | LNER | Gresley | 0-6-0 | 11/10/1935 | 27/08/1960 | |
2993 | 1644 | J39 | LNER | Gresley | 0-6-0 | 17/10/1935 | 03/12/1962 | |
2994 | 1645 | J39 | LNER | Gresley | 0-6-0 | 22/10/1935 | 19/02/1960 | |
1436 | 1646 | J39 | LNER | Gresley | 0-6-0 | 31/10/1935 | 03/12/1962 | |
1460 | 1647 | J39 | LNER | Gresley | 0-6-0 | 04/11/1935 | 03/12/1962 | |
1464 | 1648 | J39 | LNER | Gresley | 0-6-0 | 08/11/1935 | 22/10/1961 | |
1465 | 1649 | J39 | LNER | Gresley | 0-6-0 | 13/11/1935 | 31/01/1962 | |
1473 | 1650 | J39 | LNER | Gresley | 0-6-0 | 15/11/1935 | 03/12/1962 | |
1474 | 1651 | J39 | LNER | Gresley | 0-6-0 | 20/11/1935 | 03/12/1962 | |
1485 | 1652 | J39 | LNER | Gresley | 0-6-0 | 26/11/1935 | 24/09/1962 | |
1486 | 1653 | J39 | LNER | Gresley | 0-6-0 | 05/12/1935 | 24/02/1962 | |
1504 | 1654 | J39 | LNER | Gresley | 0-6-0 | 03/12/1935 | 18/04/1962 | |
1505 | 1655 | J39 | LNER | Gresley | 0-6-0 | 06/12/1935 | 03/12/1962 | |
1506 | 1656 | J39 | LNER | Gresley | 0-6-0 | 13/12/1935 | 18/01/1962 | |
1584 | 1657 | J39 | LNER | Gresley | 0-6-0 | 20/12/1935 | 15/10/1962 |