Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Advertising



Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 13 Online
» 594 Today
» 1156 Yesterday
» 5065 Week
» 16111 Month
» 16111 Year
» 1681487 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Manufacturer: Darlington Works



Order Details for Lot No: DA/DT219
Builder Darlington Works
Order Date 1906
For 20 Steam locomotives
Class J27

Number (as built) Works Number Class Built For Designer Wheels Date to Service Date Withdrawn Info
790   J27 NER Worsdell 0-6-0 04/1906 24/04/1959  
814   J27 NER Worsdell 0-6-0 04/1906 19/10/1959  
836   J27 NER Worsdell 0-6-0 04/1906 20/11/1961  
839   J27 NER Worsdell 0-6-0 05/1906 02/06/1959  
880   J27 NER Worsdell 0-6-0 05/1906 27/08/1959  
883   J27 NER Worsdell 0-6-0 06/1906 16/06/1959  
888   J27 NER Worsdell 0-6-0 06/1906 16/04/1962  
891   J27 NER Worsdell 0-6-0 06/1906 14/05/1962  
917   J27 NER Worsdell 0-6-0 06/1906 05/06/1966  
938   J27 NER Worsdell 0-6-0 06/1906 01/07/1967  
1006   J27 NER Worsdell 0-6-0 09/1906 07/08/1966  
1016   J27 NER Worsdell 0-6-0 09/1906 12/10/1964  
1018   J27 NER Worsdell 0-6-0 09/1906 10/05/1965  
1052   J27 NER Worsdell 0-6-0 10/1906 16/04/1959  
1189   J27 NER Worsdell 0-6-0 10/1906 28/06/1965  
1227   J27 NER Worsdell 0-6-0 10/1906 12/07/1967  
1256   J27 NER Worsdell 0-6-0 11/1906 15/05/1966  
1393   J27 NER Worsdell 0-6-0 11/1906 27/11/1962  
1402   J27 NER Worsdell 0-6-0 11/1906 02/06/1959  
1686   J27 NER Worsdell 0-6-0 12/1906 06/08/1962