Manufacturer: Darlington Works
Builder | Darlington Works |
Order Date | 1908 |
For | 10 Steam locomotives |
Class | J27 |
Number (as built) | Works Number | Class | Built For | Designer | Wheels | Date to Service | Date Withdrawn | Info |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
1001 | J27 | NER | Worsdell | 0-6-0 | 06/1908 | 10/09/1962 | ||
1003 | J27 | NER | Worsdell | 0-6-0 | 06/1908 | 31/07/1966 | ||
1004 | J27 | NER | Worsdell | 0-6-0 | 06/1908 | 07/08/1966 | ||
1005 | J27 | NER | Worsdell | 0-6-0 | 06/1908 | 16/04/1959 | ||
1007 | J27 | NER | Worsdell | 0-6-0 | 08/1908 | 01/07/1967 | ||
1013 | J27 | NER | Worsdell | 0-6-0 | 09/1908 | 20/01/1966 | ||
1008 | J27 | NER | Worsdell | 0-6-0 | 10/1908 | 08/1959 | ||
1010 | J27 | NER | Worsdell | 0-6-0 | 10/1908 | 14/05/1962 | ||
1011 | J27 | NER | Worsdell | 0-6-0 | 11/1908 | 15/03/1965 | ||
1012 | J27 | NER | Worsdell | 0-6-0 | 11/1908 | 04/09/1966 |