Manufacturer: Darlington Works
Builder | Darlington Works |
Order Date | 1923 |
For | 10 Steam locomotives |
Class | J27 |
Information | Superheated |
Number (as built) | Works Number | Class | Built For | Designer | Wheels | Date to Service | Date Withdrawn | Info |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
2383 | 1192 | J27 | NER | Worsdell | 0-6-0 | 06/1923 | 07/06/1967 | |
2384 | 1193 | J27 | NER | Worsdell | 0-6-0 | 06/1923 | 24/08/1959 | |
2385 | 1194 | J27 | NER | Worsdell | 0-6-0 | 06/1923 | 06/05/1963 | |
2386 | 1195 | J27 | NER | Worsdell | 0-6-0 | 06/1923 | 09/12/1963 | |
2387 | 1196 | J27 | NER | Worsdell | 0-6-0 | 06/1923 | 10/02/1964 | |
2388 | 1197 | J27 | NER | Worsdell | 0-6-0 | 07/1923 | 06/05/1963 | |
2389 | 1198 | J27 | NER | Worsdell | 0-6-0 | 07/1923 | 23/12/1963 | |
2390 | 1199 | J27 | NER | Worsdell | 0-6-0 | 08/1923 | 07/08/1967 | |
2391 | 1200 | J27 | NER | Worsdell | 0-6-0 | 09/1923 | 31/07/1966 | |
2392 | 1201 | J27 | NER | Worsdell | 0-6-0 | 09/1923 | 09/09/1967 |