Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Advertising



Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 10 Online
» 239 Today
» 957 Yesterday
» 4216 Week
» 15453 Month
» 248373 Year
» 1913749 Total
Record: 2004 (05/06/2021)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Manufacturer: Derby Works



Order Details for Lot No: DE/151
Builder Derby Works
Order Date 1943
For 10 Steam locomotives
Class 5MT

Number (as built) Works Number Class Built For Designer Wheels Date to Service Date Withdrawn Info
5472   5MT LMS Stanier 4-6-0 04/1943 02/09/1966  
5473   5MT LMS Stanier 4-6-0 05/1943 19/11/1966  
5474   5MT LMS Stanier 4-6-0 05/1943 02/09/1966  
5475   5MT LMS Stanier 4-6-0 06/1943 02/09/1966  
5476   5MT LMS Stanier 4-6-0 07/1943 10/1964  
5477   5MT LMS Stanier 4-6-0 07/1943 17/08/1966  
5478   5MT LMS Stanier 4-6-0 08/1943 10/12/1966  
5479   5MT LMS Stanier 4-6-0 08/1943 05/1964  
5480   5MT LMS Stanier 4-6-0 08/1943 22/08/1966  
5481   5MT LMS Stanier 4-6-0 09/1943 30/09/1967