Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Advertising



Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 5 Online
» 74 Today
» 938 Yesterday
» 4989 Week
» 16226 Month
» 249146 Year
» 1914522 Total
Record: 2004 (05/06/2021)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Manufacturer: Derby Works



Order Details for Lot No: DE/153
Builder Derby Works
Order Date 1944
For 15 Steam locomotives
Class 5MT

Number (as built) Works Number Class Built For Designer Wheels Date to Service Date Withdrawn Info
4800   5MT LMS Stanier 4-6-0 05/1944 16/03/1968  
4801   5MT LMS Stanier 4-6-0 05/1944 05/1964  
4802   5MT LMS Stanier 4-6-0 06/1944 29/06/1968  
4803   5MT LMS Stanier 4-6-0 06/1944 06/1968  
4804   5MT LMS Stanier 4-6-0 06/1944 02/03/1968  
4805   5MT LMS Stanier 4-6-0 06/1944 16/09/1967  
4806   5MT LMS Stanier 4-6-0 07/1944 03/08/1968  
5492   5MT LMS Stanier 4-6-0 01/1944 31/12/1966  
5493   5MT LMS Stanier 4-6-0 01/1944 06/01/1968  
5494   5MT LMS Stanier 4-6-0 01/1944 16/09/1967  
5495   5MT LMS Stanier 4-6-0 02/1944 04/03/1967  
5496   5MT LMS Stanier 4-6-0 02/1944 08/06/1964  
5497   5MT LMS Stanier 4-6-0 04/1944 02/1964  
5498   5MT LMS Stanier 4-6-0 04/1944 26/06/1965  
5499   5MT LMS Stanier 4-6-0 04/1944 07/1965