Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Advertising



Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 9 Online
» 257 Today
» 957 Yesterday
» 4234 Week
» 15471 Month
» 248391 Year
» 1913767 Total
Record: 2004 (05/06/2021)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Manufacturer: Derby Works



Order Details for Lot No: DE/170
Builder Derby Works
Order Date 1944
For 19 Steam locomotives
Class 5MT

Number (as built) Works Number Class Built For Designer Wheels Date to Service Date Withdrawn Info
4807   5MT LMS Stanier 4-6-0 09/1944 02/03/1968  
4808   5MT LMS Stanier 4-6-0 09/1944 31/12/1966  
4809   5MT LMS Stanier 4-6-0 09/1944 03/08/1968  
4810   5MT LMS Stanier 4-6-0 10/1944 13/08/1966  
4811   5MT LMS Stanier 4-6-0 10/1944 08/10/1966  
4812   5MT LMS Stanier 4-6-0 10/1944 16/09/1967  
4813   5MT LMS Stanier 4-6-0 10/1944 03/09/1966  
4814   5MT LMS Stanier 4-6-0 10/1944 16/09/1967  
4815   5MT LMS Stanier 4-6-0 11/1944 24/02/1968  
4816   5MT LMS Stanier 4-6-0 11/1944 20/07/1968  
4817   5MT LMS Stanier 4-6-0 11/1944 12/08/1967  
4818   5MT LMS Stanier 4-6-0 11/1944 29/06/1968  
4819   5MT LMS Stanier 4-6-0 11/1944 11/1967  
4820   5MT LMS Stanier 4-6-0 12/1944 31/12/1966  
4821   5MT LMS Stanier 4-6-0 12/1944 10/06/1967  
4822   5MT LMS Stanier 4-6-0 12/1944 21/10/1967  
4823   5MT LMS Stanier 4-6-0 12/1944 20/11/1965  
4824   5MT LMS Stanier 4-6-0 12/1944 10/1967  
4825   5MT LMS Stanier 4-6-0 12/1944 07/10/1967