Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Advertising



Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 5 Online
» 69 Today
» 938 Yesterday
» 4984 Week
» 16221 Month
» 249141 Year
» 1914517 Total
Record: 2004 (05/06/2021)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Manufacturer: Derby Works



Order Details for Lot No: DE/5938
Builder Derby Works
Order Date 1924
For 20 Steam locomotives
Class Compound

Number (as built) Works Number Class Built For Designer Wheels Date to Service Date Withdrawn Info
1045   Compound LMS Fowler 4-4-0 02/1924 08/06/1957  
1046   Compound LMS Fowler 4-4-0 02/1924 24/01/1953  
1047   Compound LMS Fowler 4-4-0 02/1924 10/02/1954  
1048   Compound LMS Fowler 4-4-0 03/1924 19/10/1957  
1049   Compound LMS Fowler 4-4-0 03/1924 03/1959  
1050   Compound LMS Fowler 4-4-0 03/1924 02/06/1956  
1051   Compound LMS Fowler 4-4-0 03/1924 06/11/1954  
1052   Compound LMS Fowler 4-4-0 04/1924 04/1953  
1053   Compound LMS Fowler 4-4-0 04/1924 26/05/1956  
1054   Compound LMS Fowler 4-4-0 04/1924 18/09/1954  
1055   Compound LMS Fowler 4-4-0 04/1924 02/1953  
1056   Compound LMS Fowler 4-4-0 05/1924 24/10/1953  
1057   Compound LMS Fowler 4-4-0 05/1924 02/05/1953  
1058   Compound LMS Fowler 4-4-0 05/1924 10/02/1954  
1059   Compound LMS Fowler 4-4-0 06/1924 12/11/1955  
1060   Compound LMS Fowler 4-4-0 06/1924 01/03/1958  
1061   Compound LMS Fowler 4-4-0 06/1924 28/05/1955  
1062   Compound LMS Fowler 4-4-0 06/1924 02/05/1959  
1063   Compound LMS Fowler 4-4-0 07/1924 04/10/1960  
1064   Compound LMS Fowler 4-4-0 07/1924 19/01/1957