Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Advertising



Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 11 Online
» 305 Today
» 957 Yesterday
» 4282 Week
» 15519 Month
» 248439 Year
» 1913815 Total
Record: 2004 (05/06/2021)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Manufacturer: Derby Works



Order Details for Lot No: DE/6438
Builder Derby Works
Order Date 1925
For 20 Steam locomotives
Class 4F

Number (as built) Works Number Class Built For Designer Wheels Date to Service Date Withdrawn Info
4207   4F MR Fowler 0-6-0 11/1925 11/11/1963  
4208   4F MR Fowler 0-6-0 11/1925 10/1963  
4209   4F MR Fowler 0-6-0 11/1925 14/06/1963  
4210   4F MR Fowler 0-6-0 11/1925 09/10/1965  
4211   4F MR Fowler 0-6-0 12/1925 27/03/1965  
4212   4F MR Fowler 0-6-0 12/1925 12/1963  
4213   4F MR Fowler 0-6-0 12/1925 06/1964  
4214   4F MR Fowler 0-6-0 12/1925 12/1964  
4215   4F MR Fowler 0-6-0 12/1925 20/02/1965  
4216   4F MR Fowler 0-6-0 12/1925 09/1962  
4217   4F MR Fowler 0-6-0 01/1926 12/12/1959  
4218   4F MR Fowler 0-6-0 01/1926 26/03/1966  
4219   4F MR Fowler 0-6-0 01/1926 30/11/1963  
4220   4F MR Fowler 0-6-0 01/1926 26/09/1964  
4221   4F MR Fowler 0-6-0 01/1926 02/05/1964  
4222   4F MR Fowler 0-6-0 01/1926 14/11/1964  
4223   4F MR Fowler 0-6-0 01/1926 09/11/1963  
4224   4F MR Fowler 0-6-0 01/1926 03/02/1962  
4225   4F MR Fowler 0-6-0 02/1926 28/11/1959  
4226   4F MR Fowler 0-6-0 02/1926 09/1964