Manufacturer: Doncaster Works
Builder | Doncaster Works |
Order Date | 01/1899 |
For | 10 Steam locomotives |
Class | C12 |
Number (as built) | Works Number | Class | Built For | Designer | Wheels | Date to Service | Date Withdrawn | Info |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
1501 | 812 | C12 | GNR | Ivatt | 4-4-2T | 02/1899 | 08/1949 | |
1502 | 813 | C12 | GNR | Ivatt | 4-4-2T | 03/1899 | 24/01/1955 | |
1503 | 814 | C12 | GNR | Ivatt | 4-4-2T | 03/1899 | 15/04/1955 | |
1504 | 815 | C12 | GNR | Ivatt | 4-4-2T | 03/1899 | 11/01/1958 | |
1505 | 816 | C12 | GNR | Ivatt | 4-4-2T | 04/1899 | 20/11/1958 | |
1506 | 817 | C12 | GNR | Ivatt | 4-4-2T | 04/1899 | 25/05/1956 | |
1507 | 818 | C12 | GNR | Ivatt | 4-4-2T | 04/1899 | 22/05/1958 | |
1508 | 819 | C12 | GNR | Ivatt | 4-4-2T | 05/1899 | 03/04/1958 | |
1509 | 820 | C12 | GNR | Ivatt | 4-4-2T | 05/1899 | 06/08/1958 | |
1510 | 821 | C12 | GNR | Ivatt | 4-4-2T | 05/1899 | 26/10/1955 |