Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Advertising



Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 11 Online
» 242 Today
» 997 Yesterday
» 3274 Week
» 21326 Month
» 254246 Year
» 1919622 Total
Record: 2004 (05/06/2021)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Manufacturer: Doncaster Works



Order Details for Lot No: DO/229
Builder Doncaster Works
Order Date 06/1901
For 10 Steam locomotives
Class Q1

Number (as built) Works Number Class Built For Designer Wheels Date to Service Date Withdrawn Info
402 964 Q1 GNR Ivatt 0-8-0 03/1902 13/09/1927  
405 965 Q1 GNR Ivatt 0-8-0 04/1902 26/06/1935  
406 966 Q1 GNR Ivatt 0-8-0 04/1902 03/02/1934  
407 967 Q1 GNR Ivatt 0-8-0 04/1902 16/06/1934  
403 968 Q1 GNR Ivatt 0-8-0 04/1902 10/06/1929  
408 969 Q1 GNR Ivatt 0-8-0 07/1902 02/09/1927  
409 970 Q1 GNR Ivatt 0-8-0 06/1902 05/08/1931  
410 971 Q1 GNR Ivatt 0-8-0 07/1902 18/10/1935  
404 972 Q1 GNR Ivatt 0-8-0 05/1902 26/04/1929  
411 973 Q1 GNR Ivatt 0-8-0 07/1902 08/12/1930