Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Advertising



Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 1 Online
» 63 Today
» 938 Yesterday
» 4978 Week
» 16215 Month
» 249135 Year
» 1914511 Total
Record: 2004 (05/06/2021)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Manufacturer: Doncaster Works



Order Details for Lot No: DO/233
Builder Doncaster Works
Order Date 10/1902
For 19 Steam locomotives
Class Q1
Information Original order was for 20 but one was cancelled and the material used for an 0-8-2T No. 116 (Class R1)

Number (as built) Works Number Class Built For Designer Wheels Date to Service Date Withdrawn Info
423 1007 Q1 GNR Ivatt 0-8-0 07/1903 27/06/1928  
422 1008 Q1 GNR Ivatt 0-8-0 08/1903 01/08/1928  
425 1009 Q1 GNR Ivatt 0-8-0 09/1903 27/06/1928  
424 1010 Q1 GNR Ivatt 0-8-0 06/1903 10/10/1927  
426 1011 Q1 GNR Ivatt 0-8-0 09/1903 09/09/1931  
427 1012 Q1 GNR Ivatt 0-8-0 09/1903 11/04/1929  
429 1013 Q1 GNR Ivatt 0-8-0 09/1903 06/12/1930  
430 1014 Q1 GNR Ivatt 0-8-0 09/1903 03/10/1931  
428 1015 Q1 GNR Ivatt 0-8-0 09/1903 10/04/1926  
431 1016 Q1 GNR Ivatt 0-8-0 10/1903 28/11/1931  
432 1027 Q1 GNR Ivatt 0-8-0 01/1904 27/10/1931  
433 1028 Q1 GNR Ivatt 0-8-0 03/1904 08/02/1930  
434 1029 Q1 GNR Ivatt 0-8-0 03/1904 27/06/1928  
435 1050 Q1 GNR Ivatt 0-8-0 03/1904 17/05/1929  
436 1051 Q1 GNR Ivatt 0-8-0 03/1904 08/02/1930  
437 1052 Q1 GNR Ivatt 0-8-0 04/1904 01/03/1928  
438 1053 Q1 GNR Ivatt 0-8-0 08/1904 17/05/1929  
439 1054 Q1 GNR Ivatt 0-8-0 08/1904 09/02/1927  
440 1055 Q1 GNR Ivatt 0-8-0 09/1904 28/11/1931