Manufacturer: Doncaster Works
Builder | Doncaster Works |
Order Date | 11/1903 |
For | 10 Steam locomotives |
Class | C12 |
Number (as built) | Works Number | Class | Built For | Designer | Wheels | Date to Service | Date Withdrawn | Info |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
1531 | 1017 | C12 | GNR | Ivatt | 4-4-2T | 12/1903 | 07/05/1956 | |
1532 | 1018 | C12 | GNR | Ivatt | 4-4-2T | 12/1903 | 04/1937 | |
1533 | 1019 | C12 | GNR | Ivatt | 4-4-2T | 12/1903 | 12/1937 | |
1534 | 1020 | C12 | GNR | Ivatt | 4-4-2T | 12/1903 | 01/04/1955 | |
1535 | 1021 | C12 | GNR | Ivatt | 4-4-2T | 12/1903 | 01/1939 | |
1536 | 1022 | C12 | GNR | Ivatt | 4-4-2T | 12/1903 | 03/04/1958 | |
1537 | 1023 | C12 | GNR | Ivatt | 4-4-2T | 12/1903 | 07/02/1955 | |
1538 | 1024 | C12 | GNR | Ivatt | 4-4-2T | 12/1903 | 07/1948 | |
1539 | 1025 | C12 | GNR | Ivatt | 4-4-2T | 01/1904 | 15/04/1955 | |
1540 | 1026 | C12 | GNR | Ivatt | 4-4-2T | 12/1903 | 15/06/1953 |