Manufacturer: Doncaster Works
Builder | Doncaster Works |
Order Date | 1907 |
For | 10 Steam locomotives |
Class | C1 |
Number (as built) | Works Number | Class | Built For | Designer | Wheels | Date to Service | Date Withdrawn | Info |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
1422 | 1144 | C1 | GNR | Ivatt | 4-4-2 | 03/1907 | 28/09/1946 | |
1423 | 1146 | C1 | GNR | Ivatt | 4-4-2 | 04/1907 | 27/05/1947 | |
1424 | 1147 | C1 | GNR | Ivatt | 4-4-2 | 04/1907 | 03/04/1950 | |
1425 | 1148 | C1 | GNR | Ivatt | 4-4-2 | 04/1907 | 01/01/1947 | |
1427 | 1149 | C1 | GNR | Ivatt | 4-4-2 | 05/1907 | 20/02/1945 | |
1428 | 1150 | C1 | GNR | Ivatt | 4-4-2 | 05/1907 | 15/06/1946 | |
1426 | 1151 | C1 | GNR | Ivatt | 4-4-2 | 05/1907 | 29/02/1944 | |
1429 | 1152 | C1 | GNR | Ivatt | 4-4-2 | 05/1907 | 08/08/1947 | |
1430 | 1153 | C1 | GNR | Ivatt | 4-4-2 | 06/1907 | 03/02/1944 | |
1431 | 1154 | C1 | GNR | Ivatt | 4-4-2 | 06/1907 | 21/10/1944 |