Manufacturer: Doncaster Works
Builder | Doncaster Works |
Order Date | 1908 |
For | 10 Steam locomotives |
Class | C1 |
Number (as built) | Works Number | Class | Built For | Designer | Wheels | Date to Service | Date Withdrawn | Info |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
1443 | 1191 | C1 | GNR | Ivatt | 4-4-2 | 04/1908 | 02/05/1946 | |
1444 | 1192 | C1 | GNR | Ivatt | 4-4-2 | 04/1908 | 02/10/1945 | |
1442 | 1193 | C1 | GNR | Ivatt | 4-4-2 | 05/1908 | 23/01/1947 | |
1445 | 1194 | C1 | GNR | Ivatt | 4-4-2 | 05/1908 | 22/01/1949 | |
1446 | 1195 | C1 | GNR | Ivatt | 4-4-2 | 05/1908 | 03/01/1948 | |
1447 | 1196 | C1 | GNR | Ivatt | 4-4-2 | 06/1908 | 07/11/1949 | |
1448 | 1197 | C1 | GNR | Ivatt | 4-4-2 | 07/1908 | 15/06/1946 | |
1450 | 1199 | C1 | GNR | Ivatt | 4-4-2 | 07/1908 | 15/06/1946 | |
1449 | 1200 | C1 | GNR | Ivatt | 4-4-2 | 07/1908 | 04/07/1947 | |
1451 | 1201 | C1 | GNR | Ivatt | 4-4-2 | 07/1908 | 29/04/1949 |