Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Advertising



Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 18 Online
» 296 Today
» 957 Yesterday
» 4273 Week
» 15510 Month
» 248430 Year
» 1913806 Total
Record: 2004 (05/06/2021)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Manufacturer: Doncaster Works



Order Details for Lot No: DO/268
Builder Doncaster Works
Order Date 09/1911
For 10 Steam locomotives
Class N1

Number (as built) Works Number Class Built For Designer Wheels Date to Service Date Withdrawn Info
1596 1341 N1 GNR Ivatt 0-6-2T 05/1912 14/03/1955  
1597 1342 N1 GNR Ivatt 0-6-2T 06/1912 02/04/1959  
1598 1343 N1 GNR Ivatt 0-6-2T 06/1912 12/12/1956  
1599 1344 N1 GNR Ivatt 0-6-2T 06/1912 27/10/1952  
1600 1345 N1 GNR Ivatt 0-6-2T 06/1912 06/1951  
1601 1346 N1 GNR Ivatt 0-6-2T 06/1912 28/05/1956  
1602 1347 N1 GNR Ivatt 0-6-2T 06/1912 30/08/1954  
1603 1348 N1 GNR Ivatt 0-6-2T 06/1912 07/03/1955  
1604 1349 N1 GNR Ivatt 0-6-2T 06/1912 30/09/1957  
1605 1350 N1 GNR Ivatt 0-6-2T 06/1912 01/11/1954