Manufacturer: Doncaster Works
Builder | Doncaster Works |
Order Date | 1913 |
For | 9 Steam locomotives |
Class | K1 |
Number (as built) | Works Number | Class | Built For | Designer | Wheels | Date to Service | Date Withdrawn | Info |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
1631 | 1372 | K1 | GNR | Gresley | 2-6-0 | 02/1913 | 30/12/1959 | |
1632 | 1373 | K1 | GNR | Gresley | 2-6-0 | 02/1913 | 22/09/1955 | |
1633 | 1374 | K1 | GNR | Gresley | 2-6-0 | 02/1913 | 04/11/1959 | |
1634 | 1375 | K1 | GNR | Gresley | 2-6-0 | 02/1913 | 03/01/1958 | |
1635 | 1376 | K1 | GNR | Gresley | 2-6-0 | 03/1913 | 26/01/1958 | |
1636 | 1377 | K1 | GNR | Gresley | 2-6-0 | 03/1913 | 07/05/1957 | |
1637 | 1378 | K1 | GNR | Gresley | 2-6-0 | 03/1913 | 06/06/1956 | |
1638 | 1379 | K1 | GNR | Gresley | 2-6-0 | 04/1913 | 06/12/1960 | |
1639 | 1380 | K1 | GNR | Gresley | 2-6-0 | 04/1913 | 25/06/1957 |