Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Advertising



Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 4 Online
» 220 Today
» 1021 Yesterday
» 4566 Week
» 4566 Month
» 71428 Year
» 1736804 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Manufacturer: Doncaster Works



Order Details for Lot No: DO/274
Builder Doncaster Works
Order Date 05/1913
For 5 Steam locomotives
Class O3

Number (as built) Works Number Class Built For Designer Wheels Date to Service Date Withdrawn Info
456 1411 O3 GNR Gresley 2-8-0 12/1913 24/07/1951  
457 1412 O3 GNR Gresley 2-8-0 12/1913 17/03/1952  
458 1413 O3 GNR Gresley 2-8-0 01/1914 08/10/1951  
459 1415 O3 GNR Gresley 2-8-0 01/1914 15/10/1951  
460 1418 O3 GNR Gresley 2-8-0 02/1914 16/05/1951