Manufacturer: Doncaster Works
Builder | Doncaster Works |
Order Date | 1913 |
For | 10 Steam locomotives |
Class | J6 |
Number (as built) | Works Number | Class | Built For | Designer | Wheels | Date to Service | Date Withdrawn | Info |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
566 | 1401 | J6 | GNR | Ivatt | 0-6-0 | 08/1913 | 24/03/1959 | |
567 | 1402 | J6 | GNR | Ivatt | 0-6-0 | 09/1913 | 12/12/1958 | |
568 | 1403 | J6 | GNR | Ivatt | 0-6-0 | 09/1913 | 01/01/1959 | |
569 | 1404 | J6 | GNR | Ivatt | 0-6-0 | 09/1913 | 18/09/1958 | |
570 | 1405 | J6 | GNR | Ivatt | 0-6-0 | 09/1913 | 13/11/1961 | |
571 | 1406 | J6 | GNR | Ivatt | 0-6-0 | 09/1913 | 09/06/1958 | |
572 | 1407 | J6 | GNR | Ivatt | 0-6-0 | 09/1913 | 01/01/1958 | |
573 | 1408 | J6 | GNR | Ivatt | 0-6-0 | 10/1913 | 26/11/1960 | |
574 | 1409 | J6 | GNR | Ivatt | 0-6-0 | 10/1913 | 12/04/1961 | |
575 | 1410 | J6 | GNR | Ivatt | 0-6-0 | 10/1913 | 14/05/1959 |