Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Advertising



Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 14 Online
» 639 Today
» 1172 Yesterday
» 1811 Week
» 20712 Month
» 20712 Year
» 1686088 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Manufacturer: Doncaster Works



Order Details for Lot No: DO/319
Builder Doncaster Works
Order Date 01/1929
For 10 Steam locomotives
Class V1
Information Built for Scotland

Number (as built) Works Number Class Built For Designer Wheels Date to Service Date Withdrawn Info
2900 1745 V1 LNER Gresley 2-6-2T 09/1930 29/12/1962  
2901 1746 V1 LNER Gresley 2-6-2T 10/1930 22/01/1962  
2902 1747 V1 LNER Gresley 2-6-2T 10/1930 07/05/1962  
2903 1748 V1 LNER Gresley 2-6-2T 10/1930 02/04/1962  
2904 1749 V1 LNER Gresley 2-6-2T 11/1930 29/12/1962  
2905 1750 V1 LNER Gresley 2-6-2T 11/1930 29/12/1962  
2906 1751 V1 LNER Gresley 2-6-2T 12/1930 29/12/1962  
2907 1752 V1 LNER Gresley 2-6-2T 12/1930 29/12/1962  
2908 1753 V1 LNER Gresley 2-6-2T 12/1930 29/12/1962  
2909 1754 V1 LNER Gresley 2-6-2T 02/1931 05/02/1962