Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Advertising



Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 14 Online
» 572 Today
» 1172 Yesterday
» 1744 Week
» 20645 Month
» 20645 Year
» 1686021 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Manufacturer: Doncaster Works



Order Details for Lot No: DO/320
Builder Doncaster Works
Order Date 01/1929
For 10 Steam locomotives
Class V1
Information Built for Scotland

Number (as built) Works Number Class Built For Designer Wheels Date to Service Date Withdrawn Info
2910 1755 V1 LNER Gresley 2-6-2T 04/1931 21/06/1961  
2911 1756 V1 LNER Gresley 2-6-2T 04/1931 29/12/1962  
2912 1757 V1 LNER Gresley 2-6-2T 04/1931 21/01/1961  
2913 1758 V1 LNER Gresley 2-6-2T 05/1931 25/01/1962  
2914 1759 V1 LNER Gresley 2-6-2T 06/1931 30/07/1962  
2915 1760 V1 LNER Gresley 2-6-2T 06/1931 29/12/1962  
2916 1761 V1 LNER Gresley 2-6-2T 07/1931 29/12/1962  
2917 1762 V1 LNER Gresley 2-6-2T 08/1931 27/08/1962  
2918 1763 V1 LNER Gresley 2-6-2T 08/1931 29/12/1962  
2919 1764 V1 LNER Gresley 2-6-2T 08/1931 29/12/1962