Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Advertising



Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 19 Online
» 617 Today
» 1172 Yesterday
» 1789 Week
» 20690 Month
» 20690 Year
» 1686066 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Manufacturer: Doncaster Works



Order Details for Lot No: DO/321
Builder Doncaster Works
Order Date 01/1929
For 8 Steam locomotives
Class V1
Information Built for Scotland

Number (as built) Works Number Class Built For Designer Wheels Date to Service Date Withdrawn Info
2920 1765 V1 LNER Gresley 2-6-2T 10/1931 24/11/1964  
2921 1766 V1 LNER Gresley 2-6-2T 10/1931 29/12/1962  
2922 1767 V1 LNER Gresley 2-6-2T 10/1931 05/03/1962  
2923 1768 V1 LNER Gresley 2-6-2T 11/1931 25/01/1962  
2924 1769 V1 LNER Gresley 2-6-2T 11/1931 21/09/1960  
2925 1770 V1 LNER Gresley 2-6-2T 12/1931 29/12/1962  
2926 1771 V1 LNER Gresley 2-6-2T 12/1931 29/12/1962  
2927 1772 V1 LNER Gresley 2-6-2T 12/1931 22/08/1961