Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Advertising



Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 18 Online
» 773 Today
» 1172 Yesterday
» 773 Week
» 19674 Month
» 19674 Year
» 1685050 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Manufacturer: Doncaster Works



Order Details for Lot No: DO/324
Builder Doncaster Works
Order Date 12/1929
For 6 Steam locomotives
Class V1
Information Built for Scotland

Number (as built) Works Number Class Built For Designer Wheels Date to Service Date Withdrawn Info
2928 1799 V1 LNER Gresley 2-6-2T 12/1934 24/11/1964  
2929 1801 V1 LNER Gresley 2-6-2T 02/1935 07/05/1962  
2930 1802 V1 LNER Gresley 2-6-2T 03/1935 29/12/1962  
2931 1803 V1 LNER Gresley 2-6-2T 03/1935 05/03/1962  
2932 1804 V1 LNER Gresley 2-6-2T 03/1935 29/12/1962  
2933 1805 V1 LNER Gresley 2-6-2T 04/1935 29/12/1962