Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Advertising



Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 18 Online
» 680 Today
» 1172 Yesterday
» 680 Week
» 19581 Month
» 19581 Year
» 1684957 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Manufacturer: Doncaster Works



Order Details for Lot No: DO/333
Builder Doncaster Works
Order Date 11/1933
For 10 Steam locomotives
Class V1
Information Built for the N.E.

Number (as built) Works Number Class Built For Designer Wheels Date to Service Date Withdrawn Info
417 1806 V1 LNER Gresley 2-6-2T 04/1935 16/04/1962  
446 1807 V1 LNER Gresley 2-6-2T 04/1935 09/1953  
477 1808 V1 LNER Gresley 2-6-2T 05/1935 02/11/1964  
479 1809 V1 LNER Gresley 2-6-2T 05/1935 24/05/1962  
481 1810 V1 LNER Gresley 2-6-2T 05/1935 02/11/1964  
484 1811 V1 LNER Gresley 2-6-2T 06/1935 22/10/1962  
486 1812 V1 LNER Gresley 2-6-2T 06/1935 02/11/1964  
487 1813 V1 LNER Gresley 2-6-2T 06/1935 22/10/1962  
497 1814 V1 LNER Gresley 2-6-2T 07/1935 04/06/1964  
498 1815 V1 LNER Gresley 2-6-2T 07/1935 02/11/1964