Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Advertising



Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 11 Online
» 558 Today
» 1172 Yesterday
» 1730 Week
» 20631 Month
» 20631 Year
» 1686007 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Manufacturer: Doncaster Works



Order Details for Lot No: DO/335
Builder Doncaster Works
Order Date 11/1933
For 10 Steam locomotives
Class V1
Information 3 built for Scotland, the rest for the N.E

Number (as built) Works Number Class Built For Designer Wheels Date to Service Date Withdrawn Info
402 1816 V1 LNER Gresley 2-6-2T 08/1935 07/05/1962  
414 1817 V1 LNER Gresley 2-6-2T 08/1935 29/12/1962  
415 1820 V1 LNER Gresley 2-6-2T 10/1935 24/11/1964  
416 1822 V1 LNER Gresley 2-6-2T 11/1935 21/01/1963  
418 1824 V1 LNER Gresley 2-6-2T 12/1935 25/01/1962  
2897 1825 V1 LNER Gresley 2-6-2T 12/1935 09/07/1962  
419 1826 V1 LNER Gresley 2-6-2T 01/1936 10/08/1961  
422 1827 V1 LNER Gresley 2-6-2T 01/1936 19/05/1964  
423 1828 V1 LNER Gresley 2-6-2T 01/1936 23/12/1963  
428 1829 V1 LNER Gresley 2-6-2T 02/1936 23/09/1963