Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Advertising



Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 22 Online
» 774 Today
» 1083 Yesterday
» 5246 Week
» 24147 Month
» 24147 Year
» 1689523 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Manufacturer: Doncaster Works



Order Details for Lot No: DO/337
Builder Doncaster Works
Order Date 03/1935
For 8 Steam locomotives
Class V1
Information Built for the N.E. - originally a larger order but this was curtailed by the N.E. electrification scheme

Number (as built) Works Number Class Built For Designer Wheels Date to Service Date Withdrawn Info
440 1830 V1 LNER Gresley 2-6-2T 03/1936 23/09/1963  
2898 1831 V1 LNER Gresley 2-6-2T 03/1936 05/03/1962  
454 1832 V1 LNER Gresley 2-6-2T 03/1936 23/12/1963  
455 1833 V1 LNER Gresley 2-6-2T 04/1936 29/12/1962  
461 1834 V1 LNER Gresley 2-6-2T 04/1936 23/09/1963  
465 1835 V1 LNER Gresley 2-6-2T 05/1936 12/02/1962  
466 1838 V1 LNER Gresley 2-6-2T 07/1936 05/02/1962  
2899 1844 V1 LNER Gresley 2-6-2T 10/1936 05/02/1962