Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Advertising



Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 17 Online
» 748 Today
» 1083 Yesterday
» 5220 Week
» 24121 Month
» 24121 Year
» 1689497 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Manufacturer: Doncaster Works



Order Details for Lot No: DO/344
Builder Doncaster Works
Order Date 11/1936
For 10 Steam locomotives
Class V1
Information 1st, 5th and 9th locos for Scotland, rest for G.E.

Number (as built) Works Number Class Built For Designer Wheels Date to Service Date Withdrawn Info
404 1878 V1 LNER Gresley 2-6-2T 07/1938 14/01/1963  
407 1879 V1 LNER Gresley 2-6-2T 07/1938 23/09/1963  
420 1880 V1 LNER Gresley 2-6-2T 07/1938 29/12/1962  
424 1881 V1 LNER Gresley 2-6-2T 08/1938 23/06/1961  
425 1882 V1 LNER Gresley 2-6-2T 08/1938 05/02/1962  
447 1883 V1 LNER Gresley 2-6-2T 09/1938 02/08/1962  
448 1884 V1 LNER Gresley 2-6-2T 10/1938 29/12/1962  
451 1885 V1 LNER Gresley 2-6-2T 10/1938 28/09/1961  
467 1886 V1 LNER Gresley 2-6-2T 10/1938 10/08/1961  
469 1887 V1 LNER Gresley 2-6-2T 10/1938 07/07/1960