Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Advertising



Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 19 Online
» 586 Today
» 1172 Yesterday
» 1758 Week
» 20659 Month
» 20659 Year
» 1686035 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Manufacturer: Doncaster Works



Order Details for Lot No: DO/345
Builder Doncaster Works
Order Date 11/1936
For 10 Steam locomotives
Class V1
Information 3rd and 8th locos for Scotland, rest for G.E.

Number (as built) Works Number Class Built For Designer Wheels Date to Service Date Withdrawn Info
472 1888 V1 LNER Gresley 2-6-2T 11/1938 29/12/1962  
478 1889 V1 LNER Gresley 2-6-2T 11/1938 01/10/1962  
480 1890 V1 LNER Gresley 2-6-2T 11/1938 29/12/1962  
483 1891 V1 LNER Gresley 2-6-2T 12/1938 29/12/1962  
485 1892 V1 LNER Gresley 2-6-2T 29/12/1938 30/07/1962  
488 1893 V1 LNER Gresley 2-6-2T 07/01/1939 01/10/1962  
489 1894 V1 LNER Gresley 2-6-2T 02/1939 02/11/1964  
490 1895 V1 LNER Gresley 2-6-2T 02/1939 25/01/1962  
491 1896 V1 LNER Gresley 2-6-2T 02/1939 29/12/1962  
496 1897 V1 LNER Gresley 2-6-2T 02/1939 16/11/1961