Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Advertising



Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 2 Online
» 45 Today
» 992 Yesterday
» 4764 Week
» 15909 Month
» 115694 Year
» 1781070 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Manufacturer: Gorton Works



Order Details for Lot No: GO/622
Builder Gorton Works
Class O5

Number (as built) Works Number Class Built For Designer Wheels Date to Service Date Withdrawn Info
422 O5 GCR Robinson 2-8-0 06/1919 09/12/1962  
10 O5 GCR Robinson 2-8-0 08/1919 09/12/1962  
11 O5 GCR Robinson 2-8-0 08/1919 06/06/1965  
12 O5 GCR Robinson 2-8-0 09/1919 28/05/1964  
13 O5 GCR Robinson 2-8-0 10/1919 23/06/1961  
14 O5 GCR Robinson 2-8-0 11/1920 25/10/1941  
15 O5 GCR Robinson 2-8-0 12/1920 05/06/1962  
17 O5 GCR Robinson 2-8-0 12/1920 18/10/1941  
19 O5 GCR Robinson 2-8-0 01/1921 14/09/1941  
22 O5 GCR Robinson 2-8-0 02/1921 08/08/1962