Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Advertising



Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 3 Online
» 94 Today
» 1096 Yesterday
» 2259 Week
» 2259 Month
» 69121 Year
» 1734497 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Manufacturer: Gorton Works



Order Details for Lot No: GO/637
Builder Gorton Works
Order Date 1921
For 10 Steam locomotives
Class B7

Number (as built) Works Number Class Built For Designer Wheels Date to Service Date Withdrawn Info
465 B7 GCR Robinson 4-6-0 08/1921 19/08/1948  
466 B7 GCR Robinson 4-6-0 10/1921 18/09/1948  
467 B7 GCR Robinson 4-6-0 02/1922 13/06/1949  
468 B7 GCR Robinson 4-6-0 03/1922 31/12/1948  
469 B7 GCR Robinson 4-6-0 04/1922 13/02/1950  
470 B7 GCR Robinson 4-6-0 05/1922 19/08/1948  
471 B7 GCR Robinson 4-6-0 06/1922 12/02/1949  
472 B7 GCR Robinson 4-6-0 06/1922 03/08/1948  
473 B7 GCR Robinson 4-6-0 07/1922 26/12/1949  
474 B7 GCR Robinson 4-6-0 08/1922 13/06/1949