Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Advertising



Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 18 Online
» 945 Today
» 1024 Yesterday
» 6441 Week
» 25342 Month
» 25342 Year
» 1690718 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Manufacturer: Gorton Works



Order Details for Lot No: GO/639
Builder Gorton Works
Order Date 1923
For 10 Steam locomotives
Class B7

Number (as built) Works Number Class Built For Designer Wheels Date to Service Date Withdrawn Info
475 B7 GCR Robinson 4-6-0 11/08/1923 20/02/1950  
476 B7 GCR Robinson 4-6-0 25/08/1923 04/02/1949  
477 B7 GCR Robinson 4-6-0 22/09/1923 02/11/1948  
478 B7 GCR Robinson 4-6-0 20/10/1923 03/07/1950  
479 B7 GCR Robinson 4-6-0 03/11/1923 13/06/1949  
480 B7 GCR Robinson 4-6-0 24/11/1923 03/08/1948  
5481 B7 GCR Robinson 4-6-0 08/12/1923 22/04/1948  
5482 B7 GCR Robinson 4-6-0 22/12/1923 30/11/1948  
5483 B7 GCR Robinson 4-6-0 02/02/1924 05/09/1949  
5484 B7 GCR Robinson 4-6-0 01/03/1924 04/06/1948