Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Advertising



Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 5 Online
» 60 Today
» 1083 Yesterday
» 4532 Week
» 23433 Month
» 23433 Year
» 1688809 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Manufacturer: Gorton Works



Order Details for Lot No: GO/640
Builder Gorton Works
Order Date 1913
For 11 Steam locomotives
Class B8

Number (as built) Works Number Class Built For Designer Wheels Date to Service Date Withdrawn Info
4 B8 GCR Robinson 4-6-0 06/1913 28/11/1947  
439 B8 GCR Robinson 4-6-0 07/1914 14/08/1947  
440 B8 GCR Robinson 4-6-0 08/1914 23/10/1947  
441 B8 GCR Robinson 4-6-0 09/1914 06/05/1947  
442 B8 GCR Robinson 4-6-0 09/1914 24/03/1949  
443 B8 GCR Robinson 4-6-0 10/1914 15/03/1948  
444 B8 GCR Robinson 4-6-0 10/1914 02/09/1948  
445 B8 GCR Robinson 4-6-0 11/1914 14/08/1947  
446 B8 GCR Robinson 4-6-0 11/1914 23/04/1949  
279 B8 GCR Robinson 4-6-0 12/1914 13/08/1948  
280 B8 GCR Robinson 4-6-0 01/1915 25/03/1947