Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Advertising



Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 4 Online
» 84 Today
» 1127 Yesterday
» 84 Week
» 26705 Month
» 26705 Year
» 1692081 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Manufacturer: Gorton Works



Order Details for Lot No: GO/GO402
Builder Gorton Works
Order Date 1906
For 8 Steam locomotives
Class C4
Information The order was initially for 10 locomotives but was altered to 8, the remaining 2 being built as C5 compounds.

Number (as built) Works Number Class Built For Designer Wheels Date to Service Date Withdrawn Info
260   C4 GCR Robinson 4-4-2 02/1906 02/12/1950  
261   C4 GCR Robinson 4-4-2 03/1906 22/11/1950  
262   C4 GCR Robinson 4-4-2 04/1906 03/02/1948  
358   C4 GCR Robinson 4-4-2 05/1906 05/04/1948  
360   C4 GCR Robinson 4-4-2 06/1906 23/06/1948  
361   C4 GCR Robinson 4-4-2 07/1906 04/02/1949  
362   C4 GCR Robinson 4-4-2 06/1906 30/01/1948  
363   C4 GCR Robinson 4-4-2 08/1906 14/04/1949