Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Advertising



Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 17 Online
» 266 Today
» 1097 Yesterday
» 2535 Week
» 21436 Month
» 21436 Year
» 1686812 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Manufacturer: Gorton Works



Order Details for Lot No: GO/GO615
Builder Gorton Works
Order Date 1912
For 6 Steam locomotives
Class B19

Number (as built) Works Number Class Built For Designer Wheels Date to Service Date Withdrawn Info
423 B19 GCR Robinson 4-6-0 12/1912 19/04/1947  
424 B19 GCR Robinson 4-6-0 01/1913 01/12/1945  
425 B19 GCR Robinson 4-6-0 02/1913 04/07/1947  
426 B19 GCR Robinson 4-6-0 03/1913 22/12/1944  
427 B19 GCR Robinson 4-6-0 03/1913 14/11/1947  
428 B19 GCR Robinson 4-6-0 12/1913 19/04/1947