Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Advertising



Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 11 Online
» 917 Today
» 1096 Yesterday
» 3082 Week
» 3082 Month
» 69944 Year
» 1735320 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Manufacturer: Gorton Works



Order Details for Lot No: GO/GO977
Builder Gorton Works
Order Date 1903
For 12 Steam locomotives
Class J11

Number (as built) Works Number Class Built For Designer Wheels Date to Service Date Withdrawn Info
177 J11 GCR Robinson 0-6-0 11/1903 21/10/1962  
197 J11 GCR Robinson 0-6-0 12/1903 25/07/1962  
202 J11 GCR Robinson 0-6-0 12/1903 15/08/1955  
204 J11 GCR Robinson 0-6-0 01/1904 09/04/1960  
207 J11 GCR Robinson 0-6-0 02/1904 24/10/1955  
208 J11 GCR Robinson 0-6-0 02/1904 15/04/1961  
217 J11 GCR Robinson 0-6-0 03/1904 11/07/1955  
220 J11 GCR Robinson 0-6-0 03/1904 25/03/1959  
232 J11 GCR Robinson 0-6-0 04/1904 23/09/1962  
233 J11 GCR Robinson 0-6-0 05/1904 11/02/1961  
240 J11 GCR Robinson 0-6-0 07/1904 25/07/1961  
241 J11 GCR Robinson 0-6-0 07/1904 17/08/1959