Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Advertising



Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 21 Online
» 743 Today
» 1177 Yesterday
» 3049 Week
» 27883 Month
» 62215 Year
» 1727591 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Manufacturer: Gorton Works



Order Details for Lot No: GO/GO984
Builder Gorton Works
Order Date 1910
For 9 Steam locomotives
Class J11

Number (as built) Works Number Class Built For Designer Wheels Date to Service Date Withdrawn Info
947 J11 GCR Robinson 0-6-0 01/1910 24/08/1962  
948 J11 GCR Robinson 0-6-0 02/1910 29/03/1961  
949 J11 GCR Robinson 0-6-0 02/1910 21/04/1961  
950 J11 GCR Robinson 0-6-0 03/1910 07/02/1957  
951 J11 GCR Robinson 0-6-0 03/1910 22/10/1956  
952 J11 GCR Robinson 0-6-0 04/1910 06/04/1962  
953 J11 GCR Robinson 0-6-0 04/1910 22/12/1959  
954 J11 GCR Robinson 0-6-0 04/1910 31/05/1960  
955 J11 GCR Robinson 0-6-0 05/1910 07/10/1957