Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Advertising



Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 1 Online
» 44 Today
» 753 Yesterday
» 2842 Week
» 14524 Month
» 167477 Year
» 1832853 Total
Record: 2004 (05/06/2021)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Manufacturer: Horwich Works



Order Details for Lot No: HO/11
Builder Horwich Works
Order Date 1892
For 20 Steam locomotives
Class 1008

Number (as built) Works Number Class Built For Designer Wheels Date to Service Date Withdrawn Info
1157 151 1008 LYR Aspinall 2-4-2T 04/1892 19/11/1955  
1158 152 1008 LYR Aspinall 2-4-2T 05/1892 11/1938  
1159 153 1008 LYR Aspinall 2-4-2T 05/1892 06/10/1956  
1160 154 1008 LYR Aspinall 2-4-2T 05/1892 17/12/1955  
1161 155 1008 LYR Aspinall 2-4-2T 05/1892 13/10/1956  
1162 156 1008 LYR Aspinall 2-4-2T 05/1892 04/02/1956  
1163 157 1008 LYR Aspinall 2-4-2T 06/1892 28/04/1951  
1164 158 1008 LYR Aspinall 2-4-2T 06/1892 11/08/1956  
1065 159 1008 LYR Aspinall 2-4-2T 06/1892 12/03/1955  
1066 160 1008 LYR Aspinall 2-4-2T 06/1892 08/1940  
10 161 1008 LYR Aspinall 2-4-2T 06/1892 03/1930  
1167 162 1008 LYR Aspinall 2-4-2T 06/1892 11/1938  
1168 163 1008 LYR Aspinall 2-4-2T 07/1892 29/03/1958  
1169 164 1008 LYR Aspinall 2-4-2T 07/1892 03/1946  
287 165 1008 LYR Aspinall 2-4-2T 07/1892 12/1930  
289 166 1008 LYR Aspinall 2-4-2T 07/1892 02/1937  
321 167 1008 LYR Aspinall 2-4-2T 07/1892 02/1947  
323 168 1008 LYR Aspinall 2-4-2T 07/1892 08/1949  
334 169 1008 LYR Aspinall 2-4-2T 07/1892 01/1944  
337 170 1008 LYR Aspinall 2-4-2T 07/1892 20/03/1948