Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Advertising



Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 9 Online
» 267 Today
» 841 Yesterday
» 1108 Week
» 15044 Month
» 142487 Year
» 1807863 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Manufacturer: Horwich Works



Order Details for Lot No: HO/12
Builder Horwich Works
Order Date 1892
For 20 Steam locomotives
Class 1008

Number (as built) Works Number Class Built For Designer Wheels Date to Service Date Withdrawn Info
1170 171 1008 LYR Aspinall 2-4-2T 08/1892 12/1937  
1171 172 1008 LYR Aspinall 2-4-2T 08/1892 01/1947  
1172 173 1008 LYR Aspinall 2-4-2T 08/1892 04/1949  
1173 174 1008 LYR Aspinall 2-4-2T 08/1892 15/03/1952  
1174 175 1008 LYR Aspinall 2-4-2T 09/1892 12/1930  
1175 176 1008 LYR Aspinall 2-4-2T 09/1892 11/1934  
1176 177 1008 LYR Aspinall 2-4-2T 09/1892 05/1947  
1177 178 1008 LYR Aspinall 2-4-2T 09/1892 31/12/1949  
1178 179 1008 LYR Aspinall 2-4-2T 09/1892 03/1950  
1179 180 1008 LYR Aspinall 2-4-2T 09/1892 04/1945  
16 181 1008 LYR Aspinall 2-4-2T 09/1892 26/12/1953  
26 182 1008 LYR Aspinall 2-4-2T 09/1892 10/1928  
37 183 1008 LYR Aspinall 2-4-2T 10/1892 12/1930  
301 184 1008 LYR Aspinall 2-4-2T 10/1892 04/1934  
340 185 1008 LYR Aspinall 2-4-2T 10/1892 05/07/1952  
345 186 1008 LYR Aspinall 2-4-2T 10/1892 10/1939  
349 187 1008 LYR Aspinall 2-4-2T 10/1892 06/1939  
638 188 1008 LYR Aspinall 2-4-2T 10/1892 09/1930  
651 189 1008 LYR Aspinall 2-4-2T 11/1892 11/1934  
680 190 1008 LYR Aspinall 2-4-2T 11/1892 20/08/1955