Manufacturer: Horwich Works
Builder | Horwich Works |
Order Date | 1948 |
For | 20 Steam locomotives |
Class | 5MT |
Number (as built) | Works Number | Class | Built For | Designer | Wheels | Date to Service | Date Withdrawn | Info |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
44698 | 5MT | LMS | Stanier | 4-6-0 | 03/07/1948 | 14/07/1966 | ||
44699 | 5MT | LMS | Stanier | 4-6-0 | 10/07/1948 | 01/05/1967 | ||
44700 | 5MT | LMS | Stanier | 4-6-0 | 31/07/1948 | 14/07/1966 | ||
44701 | 5MT | LMS | Stanier | 4-6-0 | 07/08/1948 | 18/06/1964 | ||
44702 | 5MT | LMS | Stanier | 4-6-0 | 21/08/1948 | 26/06/1965 | ||
44703 | 5MT | LMS | Stanier | 4-6-0 | 28/08/1948 | 10/12/1966 | ||
44704 | 5MT | LMS | Stanier | 4-6-0 | 04/09/1948 | 02/09/1966 | ||
44705 | 5MT | LMS | Stanier | 4-6-0 | 11/09/1948 | 02/09/1966 | ||
44706 | 5MT | LMS | Stanier | 4-6-0 | 18/09/1948 | 28/12/1963 | ||
44707 | 5MT | LMS | Stanier | 4-6-0 | 25/09/1948 | 24/01/1966 | ||
44708 | 5MT | LMS | Stanier | 4-6-0 | 02/10/1948 | 20/01/1968 | ||
44709 | 5MT | LMS | Stanier | 4-6-0 | 09/10/1948 | 03/08/1968 | ||
44710 | 5MT | LMS | Stanier | 4-6-0 | 16/10/1948 | 24/12/1966 | ||
44711 | 5MT | LMS | Stanier | 4-6-0 | 23/10/1948 | 04/05/1968 | ||
44712 | 5MT | LMS | Stanier | 4-6-0 | 30/10/1948 | 12/11/1966 | ||
44713 | 5MT | LMS | Stanier | 4-6-0 | 06/11/1948 | 03/08/1968 | ||
44714 | 5MT | LMS | Stanier | 4-6-0 | 13/11/1948 | 19/11/1966 | ||
44715 | 5MT | LMS | Stanier | 4-6-0 | 20/11/1948 | 27/01/1968 | ||
44716 | 5MT | LMS | Stanier | 4-6-0 | 27/11/1948 | 31/07/1965 | ||
44717 | 5MT | LMS | Stanier | 4-6-0 | 04/12/1948 | 26/08/1967 |