Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Advertising



Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 5 Online
» 123 Today
» 1074 Yesterday
» 4615 Week
» 29449 Month
» 63781 Year
» 1729157 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Manufacturer: Horwich Works



Order Details for Lot No: HO/22
Builder Horwich Works
Order Date 1894
For 20 Steam locomotives
Class 1008

Number (as built) Works Number Class Built For Designer Wheels Date to Service Date Withdrawn Info
36 351 1008 LYR Aspinall 2-4-2T 02/1895 25/10/1958  
39 352 1008 LYR Aspinall 2-4-2T 02/1895 08/1930  
1258 353 1008 LYR Aspinall 2-4-2T 02/1895 09/1946  
1259 354 1008 LYR Aspinall 2-4-2T 02/1895 08/1930  
1260 355 1008 LYR Aspinall 2-4-2T 02/1895 04/1938  
1261 356 1008 LYR Aspinall 2-4-2T 03/1895 12/1930  
1262 357 1008 LYR Aspinall 2-4-2T 03/1895 06/1949  
1263 358 1008 LYR Aspinall 2-4-2T 03/1895 03/1959  
1264 359 1008 LYR Aspinall 2-4-2T 03/1895 03/1938  
1265 360 1008 LYR Aspinall 2-4-2T 03/1895 08/1953  
1266 361 1008 LYR Aspinall 2-4-2T 03/1895 05/02/1955  
1267 362 1008 LYR Aspinall 2-4-2T 04/1895 04/1934  
1268 363 1008 LYR Aspinall 2-4-2T 04/1895 10/1947  
1269 364 1008 LYR Aspinall 2-4-2T 04/1895 03/1939  
1270 365 1008 LYR Aspinall 2-4-2T 05/1895 01/1947  
1271 366 1008 LYR Aspinall 2-4-2T 05/1895 29/12/1951  
1272 367 1008 LYR Aspinall 2-4-2T 05/1895 14/01/1961  
1273 368 1008 LYR Aspinall 2-4-2T 05/1895 12/1946  
1274 369 1008 LYR Aspinall 2-4-2T 05/1895 05/1934  
1275 370 1008 LYR Aspinall 2-4-2T 05/1895 05/1945