Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Advertising



Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 3 Online
» 133 Today
» 1074 Yesterday
» 4625 Week
» 29459 Month
» 63791 Year
» 1729167 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Manufacturer: Horwich Works



Order Details for Lot No: HO/27
Builder Horwich Works
Order Date 1896
For 20 Steam locomotives
Class 1008

Number (as built) Works Number Class Built For Designer Wheels Date to Service Date Withdrawn Info
24 431 1008 LYR Aspinall 2-4-2T 03/1896 02/10/1958  
31 432 1008 LYR Aspinall 2-4-2T 03/1896 06/1934  
38 433 1008 LYR Aspinall 2-4-2T 03/1896 01/1929  
63 434 1008 LYR Aspinall 2-4-2T 03/1896 11/1934  
76 435 1008 LYR Aspinall 2-4-2T 03/1896 07/08/1948  
84 436 1008 LYR Aspinall 2-4-2T 03/1896 10/1945  
88 437 1008 LYR Aspinall 2-4-2T 03/1896 06/1937  
97 438 1008 LYR Aspinall 2-4-2T 04/1896 05/11/1955  
104 439 1008 LYR Aspinall 2-4-2T 04/1896 06/1949  
107 440 1008 LYR Aspinall 2-4-2T 04/1896 08/1937  
110 441 1008 LYR Aspinall 2-4-2T 04/1896 03/1934  
129 442 1008 LYR Aspinall 2-4-2T 04/1896 06/1952  
156 443 1008 LYR Aspinall 2-4-2T 04/1896 12/1951  
185 444 1008 LYR Aspinall 2-4-2T 04/1896 06/12/1947  
296 445 1008 LYR Aspinall 2-4-2T 05/1896 16/07/1949  
319 446 1008 LYR Aspinall 2-4-2T 05/1896 11/1939  
329 447 1008 LYR Aspinall 2-4-2T 05/1896 04/1934  
362 448 1008 LYR Aspinall 2-4-2T 05/1896 04/1937  
369 449 1008 LYR Aspinall 2-4-2T 05/1896 04/1945  
415 450 1008 LYR Aspinall 2-4-2T 06/1896 06/1950