Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Advertising



Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 1 Online
» 98 Today
» 1112 Yesterday
» 3516 Week
» 28350 Month
» 62682 Year
» 1728058 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Manufacturer: Horwich Works



Order Details for Lot No: HO/28
Builder Horwich Works
Order Date 1896
For 20 Steam locomotives
Class 1008

Number (as built) Works Number Class Built For Designer Wheels Date to Service Date Withdrawn Info
1311 451 1008 LYR Aspinall 2-4-2T 06/1896 12/1930  
1312 452 1008 LYR Aspinall 2-4-2T 06/1896 12/1930  
1313 453 1008 LYR Aspinall 2-4-2T 06/1896 18/02/1961  
1314 454 1008 LYR Aspinall 2-4-2T 06/1896 11/1936  
1315 455 1008 LYR Aspinall 2-4-2T 06/1896 09/1950  
1316 456 1008 LYR Aspinall 2-4-2T 06/1896 26/01/1952  
1317 457 1008 LYR Aspinall 2-4-2T 06/1896 10/12/1949  
1318 458 1008 LYR Aspinall 2-4-2T 07/1896 01/1937  
1319 459 1008 LYR Aspinall 2-4-2T 07/1896 12/08/1957  
1320 460 1008 LYR Aspinall 2-4-2T 07/1896 05/1930  
1321 461 1008 LYR Aspinall 2-4-2T 07/1896 03/1938  
1322 462 1008 LYR Aspinall 2-4-2T 08/1896 07/1950  
1323 463 1008 LYR Aspinall 2-4-2T 08/1896 11/1934  
1324 464 1008 LYR Aspinall 2-4-2T 08/1896 11/1958  
1325 465 1008 LYR Aspinall 2-4-2T 08/1896 10/1928  
1326 466 1008 LYR Aspinall 2-4-2T 08/1896 03/01/1948  
1327 467 1008 LYR Aspinall 2-4-2T 08/1896 04/1934  
1328 468 1008 LYR Aspinall 2-4-2T 09/1896 08/1938  
1329 469 1008 LYR Aspinall 2-4-2T 09/1896 19/12/1953  
1330 470 1008 LYR Aspinall 2-4-2T 09/1896 07/1938